CA SB946 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 3.5 (commencing with Section 8510) to Division 5 of the Water Code, relating to flood control.
Title
Flood control: Yolo Bypass Cache Slough Partnership Multibenefit Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 24 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 8510 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB946 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB946 |