CA SB947 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - March 17 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - March 17 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 719 and 913.13 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electrical corporations: financial performance-based incentives and performance-based metrics.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | March 17 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 17. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 719 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 913.13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB947 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB947 |