CA SB952 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6356.3 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Sales and use taxes: exemption: backup electrical generators: deenergization events.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB952 Nielsen (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 3841.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3767.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3612.) (May 28). |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6356.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |