CA SB970 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 111, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 111, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 316, 340, 1000, 1001, 1201, and 1202 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Primary election date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-24 - Assembly - SB 970 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Berman (Y: 66 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB970 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB970 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 111, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6:30 p.m. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 5. Page 5171.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 11). |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-08 | Assembly | July 13 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3684.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | June 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Set for hearing June 1. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3559.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2020-03-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 1000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 1001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 1201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 1202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 316 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 340 | Amended Code | Citation Text |