CA SB972 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 19571.5 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Corporation taxes: disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB972 Skinner Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Assembly - SB 972 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Gabriel (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB972 Skinner (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Assembly - SB 972 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Gabriel (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB972 Skinner (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2020-09-29 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 20. Page 5230.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 7.) (August 20). |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-07-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (July 27). |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2020-06-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 3797.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3613.) (May 28). |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19571.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |