CA SB983 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 26 (commencing with Section 2529.7) to Chapter 5 of Division 2 of the Business and Professions Code, and to add Division 117 (commencing with Section 150400) to the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Unused medications: cancer medication recycling.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] | Sen. Ling Ling Chang [R] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Sen. Susan Eggman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 30 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 30. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2529.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 150400 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB983 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB983 |