CA SB991 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - March 24 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - March 24 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 69951 of, to add and repeal Section 69950.5 to, and to repeal and add Section 69950 of, the Government Code, relating to courts.
Title
Court reporters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 24 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 69950.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 69951 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB991 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB991 |