CA SB994 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on E. & C.A. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on E. & C.A. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 196, 197, 198, and 205 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Section 2157.2 of, and to add Section 2157.3 to, the Elections Code, relating to jurors.
Title
Juror selection: information sharing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on E. & C.A. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and E. & C.A. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 196 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 197 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 198 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2157.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2157.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB994 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB994 |