CA SB997 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2750.3 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Worker status: employees and independent contractors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-05-15 | Senate | May 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14 in L., P.E. & R. pending receipt. |
2020-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 2750.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB997 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB997 |