CA SCR57 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-20-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-20-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to memorial highways.
Title
Memorial highways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR57 Cannella et al. Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SCR57 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SCR57 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4316.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-02-22 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 4083.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-02-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-02-20 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-02-20 | Assembly | (Corrected February 23). |
2018-02-20 | Assembly | Amended. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From inactive file by Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (September 13). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2022.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Set for hearing July 10. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 1790.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Set for hearing June 27. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |