CA SCR63 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on September 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 155, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on September 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 155, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Ovarian Cancer Awareness Month of 2019.
Title
Ovarian Cancer Awareness Month of 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SCR 63 Skinner Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR63 Skinner et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR63 Skinner et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 155, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3209.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 5). |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2267.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |