CA SJR14 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - In Assembly. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - In Assembly. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to flood control.
Title
Whittier Narrows Dam: flood protection improvements: federal funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SJR14 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Senate - Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Senate - Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3681.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3561.) (May 19). |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 24 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |