CA SJR4 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 73-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 115, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 73-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 115, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Title X.
Title
Title X.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-01 - Assembly - SJR 4 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Petrie-Norris (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR4 Leyva et al (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR4 Leyva et al (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 115, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 59. Noes 14. Page 2488.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (June 11). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 476.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 385.) (March 20). |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | March 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |