CO HB1001 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning hospital transparency measures required to analyze the efficacy of hospital delivery system reform incentive payments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospital Transparency Measures To Analyze Efficacy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 43 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 43 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1001, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1001, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.021) (Y: 22 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.019) (Y: 23 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (c.001) (Y: 23 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment H) to L.001 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment G) to L.001 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment F) to L.001 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment I) to L.001 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment J) to L.001 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1001, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D), as amended. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment L) to L.001 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment K) to L.001 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1001, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Governor Signed
2019-03-20 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-18SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-03-17SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-03-14SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-13SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-03-12SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-07SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2019-01-31HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-30HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-01-29HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-01-28HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-01-16HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1001
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1001_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1001_en2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1001_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1001_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1001_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1001_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1c5f2451d7f1abfe87258384007599ce-hb19-1001-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1c5f2451d7f1abfe87258384007599ce-hb19-1001-6-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1c5f2451d7f1abfe87258384007599ce-hb19-1001-7-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1c5f2451d7f1abfe87258384007599ce-hb19-1001-8-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1c5f2451d7f1abfe87258384007599ce-hb19-1001-9-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1c5f2451d7f1abfe87258384007599ce-hb19-1001-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1c5f2451d7f1abfe87258384007599ce-hb19-1001-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1c5f2451d7f1abfe87258384007599ce-hb19-1001-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1c5f2451d7f1abfe87258384007599ce-hb19-1001-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1c5f2451d7f1abfe87258384007599ce-hb19-1001-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1001vote623c72
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1001vote6174d4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1001vote61d536
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1001vote59c6f4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3c5ebfc187b84a4e872583b6007be91e-hb19-1001-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3c5ebfc187b84a4e872583b6007be91e-hb19-1001-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1001vote616412
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1001vote5e4b78
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1001vote5e64bc

Bill Comments

feedback