CO HB1003 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures to prevent opioid misuse in Colorado, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Opioid Misuse Prevention
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1003, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer House Bill 18-1003 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.026 [Attachment D]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.028 [Attachment E]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.029 [Attachment F]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1003, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1003, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1003, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment P). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment I) as amended. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment L). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment O). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment C), as amended. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: This is a conceptual amendment to amendment L.010 (Attachment C), line 9, after "community" insert "to develop a strategic plan." (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: This is a conceptual amendment to amendment L.001 (Attachment I), line 6, after "the" insert "Charlie Hughes and Nathan Gauna." (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1003, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1003, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1003, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer House Bill 18-1003 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.026 [Attachment D]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.028 [Attachment E]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.029 [Attachment F]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1003, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1003, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1003, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment P). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment I) as amended. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment L). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment O). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment C), as amended. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: This is a conceptual amendment to amendment L.010 (Attachment C), line 9, after "community" insert "to develop a strategic plan." (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: This is a conceptual amendment to amendment L.001 (Attachment I), line 6, after "the" insert "Charlie Hughes and Nathan Gauna." (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1003, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1003, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-21 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-04 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-05-02 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Legislative Council |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-04-19 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-13 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |