CO HB1004 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a proposal for implementing a competitive state option for more affordable health care coverage in Colorado, and, in connection therewith, requesting authorization to use existing federal money for the proposed state option and taking other actions toward the implementation of the state option, and making an appropriation.
Title
Proposal For Affordable Health Coverage Option
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1004 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1004 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.004) (Y: 16 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1004, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1004, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1004, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1004 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1004 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.004) (Y: 16 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1004, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1004, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1004, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-22 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-04-19 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-18 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-02-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-23 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |