CO HB1006 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures to mitigate the effects of wildfires within wildland-urban interface areas, and, in connection therewith, clarifying the legislative intent that state funding of the existing forest restoration and wildfire risk mitigation grant program be increased and making an appropriation.
Title
Wildfire Mitigation Wildland-urban Interface Areas
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1006 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1006, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1006 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1006, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2019-04-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-19 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-18 | House | House Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture |