CO HB1007 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning increasing the diversity of Colorado's educators in elementary and secondary public schools, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Diverse Kindergarten Through 12th Grade Educator Workforce Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Postpone House Bill 20-1007 indefinitely. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 20-1007 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1007, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 20-1007, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 20-1007, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 20-1007 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1007, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 20-1007, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 20-1007, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2020-02-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-18 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-02-14 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-14 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-28 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |