CO HB1009 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning supports for persons recovering from substance use disorders, and, in connection therewith, expanding a program in the department of local affairs that provides vouchers for housing assistance to certain individuals, creating standards for recovery residences for purposes of referrals and title protection, creating the opioid crisis recovery funds advisory committee, creating the recovery residence certification grant program, and making an appropriation.
Title
Substance Use Disorders Recovery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Adhere (Y: 21 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1009 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1009, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1009, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1009, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: This is a conceptual amendment to amendment L.009 (Attachment G), line 4, after '(IV)', add 'To the extent practicable,'. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment G) to amendment L.008 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment H) to amendment L.008 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1009, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment E), as amended. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1009, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1009 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1009, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1009, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1009, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: This is a conceptual amendment to amendment L.009 (Attachment G), line 4, after '(IV)', add 'To the extent practicable,'. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment G) to amendment L.008 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment H) to amendment L.008 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1009, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment E), as amended. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1009, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2019-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-26 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-06 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services + Appropriations |