CO HB1013 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the extension of the income tax credit for child care expenses paid by a resident individual with a federal adjusted gross income of twenty-five thousand dollars or less.
Title
Child Care Expenses Tax Credit Low-income Families
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1013 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1013 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1013 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1013, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1013, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1013 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1013 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1013 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1013, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1013, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2019-04-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-15 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-24 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |