CO HB1014 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning unconsented use of donor gametes in fertility treatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Misuse Of Human Reproductive Material

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-15 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1014 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1014, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1014, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-28 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1014, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1014, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-06 Governor Signed
2020-07-02 Sent to the Governor
2020-07-02SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-07-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-15SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-06-15SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-13SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-06-13SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-26SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2020-02-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-01-31HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-01-28HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1014
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1014_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1014_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1014_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1014_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1014_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1014_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e7dd106521bf7d9a872584fd00710431-hb20-1014-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e7dd106521bf7d9a872584fd00710431-hb20-1014-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e7dd106521bf7d9a872584fd00710431-hb20-1014-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1014vote5fadd7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1c26814cc8c743ad8725851a00779b8f-hb20-1014-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1c26814cc8c743ad8725851a00779b8f-hb20-1014-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b839bd6d6c5a18bc8725858600508367-hb20-1014-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1014vote5c04c4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1014vote6ad1f9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1014vote6ae5d1

Bill Comments

feedback