CO HB1019 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning criteria applied in determining performance ratings for entities in the elementary and secondary public education system, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Kindergarten Through Twelfth Grade Accreditation Weighted Factors
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Foote [D] | Sen. Kevin Priola [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1019 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1019, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1019, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 2 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1019, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1019, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1019 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1019, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1019, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 2 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1019, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1019, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-09 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Committee |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2018-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/26/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-04-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |