CO HB1020 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the clarification of certain administrative matters of the capital development committee.
Title
Capital Development Committee Administrative Matters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1020 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1020 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1020 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1020 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Governor Signed | |
2019-03-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2019-01-23 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-01-22 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 01/23/2019 - No Amendments |
2019-01-18 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-01-14 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |