CO HB1021 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Required Coverage Reproductive Services
Title
Required Coverage Reproductive Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Move to adopt CLHB1021.009 [See following vote sheet for a failed substitute motion] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-04 | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass | |
2010-04-22 | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass | |
2010-04-19 | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments | |
2010-03-26 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee | |
2010-03-19 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-18 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-16 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-12 | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/11/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-26 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology | |
2010-02-23 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-22 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-19 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-02-03 | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |