CO HB1021 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Colorado Channel Authority Fiscal Year
Title
Colorado Channel Authority Fiscal Year
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Steadman [D] | Sen. Nancy Todd [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1021 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1021 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1021 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1021 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1021 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1021 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1021 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1021 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1021 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1021 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1021 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-11 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-03-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-03-03 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-02 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-25 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Committee on Local Government and Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government and Energy | |
2011-01-31 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-01-28 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2011-01-25 | House Second Reading Laid Over to 01/28/2011 | |
2011-01-20 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |