CO HB1021 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Race Info ID Application
Title
Race Info ID Application
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-05-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-05-17 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-11 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2016-05-11 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Recede - CCR not produced |
2016-05-06 | House | First Conference Committee Result was to No Report |
2016-05-03 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2016-05-03 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2016-04-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-18 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-04-14 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |