CO HB1021 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
concerning an employer's violation of wage laws.
Title
Wage Theft Transparency Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 17-1021 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 17-1021 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Governor Signed | |
2017-04-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/27/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2017-02-23 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-22 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-02-21 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |