CO HB1021 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning addressing the issue of youth who are experiencing homelessness in Colorado, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Task Force For Youth Experiencing Homelessness
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1021 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment F). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-30 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1021, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-30 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1021, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment F). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-30 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1021, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-30 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1021, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-03-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-08 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/09/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-05 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/08/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-27 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/05/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-02-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-30 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |