CO HB1023 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning issuance of driving authorization documents to foster children who are under eighteen years of age, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foster Children Driving Licenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1023, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 19-1023, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 19-1023, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1023, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1023, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20 Governor Signed
2019-04-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-16SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-15SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-12SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-11SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-11SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-10SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-09SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
2019-03-11HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-08HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-07HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-03-06HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-05HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-04HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1023
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1023_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1023_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1023_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1023_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1023_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1023_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a3ad2b22988b560b872583ae00716817-hb19-1023-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1023vote5a9fd6
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a3ad2b22988b560b872583ae00716817-hb19-1023-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a3ad2b22988b560b872583ae00716817-hb19-1023-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e705c00fdfe00d70872583c9006e3bb2-hb19-1023-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e705c00fdfe00d70872583c9006e3bb2-hb19-1023-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/541c4ee8a5fc8682872583d7004af3d4-hb19-1023-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/541c4ee8a5fc8682872583d7004af3d4-hb19-1023-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1023vote5f35c2
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1023vote5e15ea
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1023vote5e0334

Bill Comments

feedback