CO HB1023 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning certain address database systems used for sales and use tax collection.
Title
State Address Data For Sales And Use Tax Collection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 20-1023 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-21 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 20-1023, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 20-1023 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-21 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 20-1023, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-03-01 | Governor Signed | |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2020-01-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-01-28 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-01-24 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-01-21 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |