CO HB1024 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning creation of the Colorado youth advisory council review committee, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Colorado Youth Advisory Council Review Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1024 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer House Bill 19-1024 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1024 to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1024, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1024 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1024 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer House Bill 19-1024 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1024 to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1024, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1024 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Legislative Council |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2019-03-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-18 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-03-15 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-31 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |