CO HB1026 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning fines assessed for violations of laws administered by the division of parks and wildlife.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parks And Wildlife Violations Of Law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1026 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1026 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 19-1026 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1026 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1026 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1026, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1026, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-10HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-10 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-25SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-24SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-23SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-19SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-16SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Finance
2019-03-18SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources
2019-03-11HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-08HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-03-08HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-28HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-01-17HouseHouse Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Amended to Finance
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1026
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1026_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1026_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1026_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1026_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1026_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1026_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d51cbd457f55ba8e87258385005d4d6e-hb19-1026-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d51cbd457f55ba8e87258385005d4d6e-hb19-1026-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/16e365d21328490e872583900079fd4e-hb19-1026-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8e29f4435b7bb8f9872583b700529c94-hb19-1026-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1026vote5b6bfa
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ae33bce949133931872583c4007152df-hb19-1026-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d925b8b806304c26872583de00716134-hb19-1026-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8c09574cd7098a33872583e100557b75-hb19-1026-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1026vote5ba92e

Bill Comments

feedback