CO HB1030 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of a single annual fleet overweight permit for a commercial motor vehicle fleet that includes both vehicles that have a quad axle grouping and vehicle combinations with a trailer that has two or three axles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial Vehicle Annual Fleet Overweight Permits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 20-1030 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1030 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1030 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1030 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor Signed
2020-03-16 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-11SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-10SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-05SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-21SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
2020-02-19HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-18HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-14HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-14HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-27HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-01-22HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to Finance
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1030
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1030_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1030_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1030_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1030_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1030_rr3.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1030_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/51039dec403decb4872584f70070d572-hb20-1030-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a8c0d1cc2497f65f872584fc0071faaa-hb20-1030-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3e1554a9f35f2a948725850e00530086-hb20-1030-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1030vote5cdeef
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dea402fa765d142787258522005f3d96-hb20-1030-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1030vote54da1a

Bill Comments

feedback