CO HB1031 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning employer entry into the fire and police pension association defined benefit system.
Title
Employer Entry FPPA Fire And Police Pension Association Defined Benefit System
Sponsors
Rep. Jovan Melton [D] | Rep. Kim Ransom [R] | Sen. John Cooke [R] | Sen. Matt Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1031 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1031 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1031 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1031 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Governor Signed | |
2018-02-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-02-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2018-01-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-01-23 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-01-17 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |