CO HB1031 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning allowing each parental guardian to serve as a minor medical marijuana patient's primary caregiver, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Child Patient More Than One Primary Caregiver
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1031, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1031, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1031, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1031, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1031, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1031, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1031 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1031, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1031, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1031, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1031, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1031, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1031, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1031 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-22 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Re-referred to Appropriations - No Amendments |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2019-02-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-02-22 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-23 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |