CO HB1031 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the establishment of a new state holiday in place of Columbus day.
Title
Replace Columbus Day With New State Holiday
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Roll Call 1031 (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1031 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 37 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C), as amended. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1031, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1031, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Roll Call 1031 (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1031 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 37 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C), as amended. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1031, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1031, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-20 | Governor Signed | |
2020-03-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2020-02-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-18 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-13 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 02/18/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-02-12 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-04 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |