CO HB1034 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a requirement that a common carrier engaged in the transportation of property by railroad have at least two crew members aboard a freight train while the freight train is moving.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minimum Two-person Crew On Freight Trains

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 19-1034 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 19-1034 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1034, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1034, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor Signed
2019-03-11 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-08HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-04SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-03-01SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-02-28SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 03/01/2019
2019-02-25SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-22SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-02-19SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
2019-02-05HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-04HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-01-30HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1034
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1034_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1034_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1034_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1034_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1034_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1034_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e71af85112459836872583920070f7d6-hb19-1034-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1034vote5aab69
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e71af85112459836872583920070f7d6-hb19-1034-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e141922b825b77b3872583a60073a205-hb19-1034-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e141922b825b77b3872583a60073a205-hb19-1034-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1034vote5de6f1
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1034vote6140d8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1034vote69a619
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1034vote69b3c7

Bill Comments

feedback