CO HB1036 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
History And Culture In Civil Government
Title
History And Culture In Civil Government
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1036 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1036 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1036 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1036 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1036, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1036, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amendment L.004 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1036, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1036 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1036 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1036 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1036, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1036, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amendment L.004 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1036, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2016-05-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-05-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-01 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |