CO HB1041 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning financial responsibility requirements for physician assistants who have been practicing for at least three years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physician Assistants Financial Responsibility Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1041 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1041 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor Signed
2020-03-16 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-04SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-03SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-27SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2020-02-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-03HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-01-29HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1041
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1041_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1041_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1041_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1041_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1041_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1041_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/14dffa08bb2924f2872584fe0064f54f-hb20-1041-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1041vote5bd1ad
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0dd6eac1e9f514798725851c0013ee33-hb20-1041-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1041vote59af79

Bill Comments

feedback