CO HB1043 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the ability of life care institutions to post a surety bond as a form of required reserve.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Life Care Institutions Post Surety Bond As Reserve

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 19-1043 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1043 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Governor Signed
2019-03-20 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-15SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-14SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-11SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
2019-01-31HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-30HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-01-29HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-28HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-01-23HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1043
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1043_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1043_en2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1043_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1043_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1043_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1043_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/22a83612c04cb1348725838b0071e193-hb19-1043-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1043vote59ec35
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ccb646ae5f97c47d872583bb0001cd9b-hb19-1043-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1043vote53edd8

Bill Comments

feedback