CO HB1044 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning advance behavioral health orders determining the scope of treatment an adult wishes to receive under certain behavioral health circumstances.
Title
Advance Behavioral Health Orders Treatment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.013) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.013) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Governor Signed | |
2019-03-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-03-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-03-04 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-03-01 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-02-27 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 03/01/2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2019-01-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-01-25 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-01-23 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |