CO HB1045 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning funding for carrying out duties related to the office of public guardianship, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Office Of Public Guardianship Operation Conditions
Sponsors
Rep. Marc Snyder [D] | Rep. Matt Soper [R] | Sen. Joann Ginal [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1045, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1045 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1045 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1045, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1045, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1045, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1045, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1045, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1045 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1045 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1045, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1045, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1045, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1045, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Finance |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-16 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-16 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-14 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |