CO HB1049 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-20 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-20 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Use Of Personal Info To Defraud
Title
Use Of Personal Info To Defraud
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1049 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1049 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1049 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1049, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1049, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1049, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1049 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1049 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1049, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1049, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1049, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-20 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely | |
2011-02-14 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2011-02-09 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-08 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-03 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-01 | House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |