CO HB1049 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Crowdfunding Escrow In Depository Institutions
Title
Crowdfunding Escrow In Depository Institutions
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Lee [D] | Sen. Mark Scheffel [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1049 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1049 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1049 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1049 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1049 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1049 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-03-01 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-03-01 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-02-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2016-01-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-01-25 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-01-20 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |