CO HB1052 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of special districts to provide early childhood development services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early Childhood Development Special District

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1052 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03 Governor Signed
2019-04-03 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-03SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-03HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-20SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-19SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
2019-02-26HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-25HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-22HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-02-19HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1052
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1052_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1052_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1052_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1052_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1052_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1052_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8f6e2264551e1e3b872583a600663fba-hb19-1052-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1052vote5ca5fc
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8f6e2264551e1e3b872583a600663fba-hb19-1052-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8f6e2264551e1e3b872583a600663fba-hb19-1052-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cd57a1da1d39e247872583bd006a585a-hb19-1052-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1052vote55b597

Bill Comments

feedback