CO HB1055 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the provision of state financial assistance for public school capital construction, and, in connection therewith, increasing the amount of retail marijuana excise tax revenue that is credited to the public school capital construction assistance fund, increasing the maximum total amount of annual lease payments payable by the state for financial assistance provided under the terms of lease-purchase agreements, more precisely tying the total amount of financial assistance provided to charter schools to the number of students enrolled in charter schools, and making an appropriation.
Title
Public School Cap Construction Financial Assistance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1055 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1055 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1055, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1055, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1055, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1055, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1055, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1055 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1055 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1055, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1055, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1055, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1055, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1055, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-07 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2019-04-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-18 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-18 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-04 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-02-07 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Finance |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Finance |