CO HB1064 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning eliminating requirements that victims must opt in to effect their rights in criminal proceedings, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Victim Notification Criminal Proceedings
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Sullivan [D] | Sen. Mark Baisley [R] | Sen. Mike Foote [D] | Sen. John Cooke [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1064 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1064, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1064, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1064, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1064, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1064, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1064 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1064, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1064, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1064, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1064, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1064, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-26 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-28 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-02-12 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |