CO HB1065 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a clarification of requirements governing the formation of metropolitan districts, and, in connection therewith, limiting the inclusion of agricultural land within a metropolitan district providing park and recreational services and clarifying signature requirements governing judicial approval of a petition for organization of a proposed special district.
Title
Clarify Requirements Formation Metropolitan District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 17-1065 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Local Government: Refer House Bill 17-1065 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 17-1065 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Local Government: Refer House Bill 17-1065 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Governor Signed | |
2017-03-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2017-02-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-06 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-01 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |