CO HB1065 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning public hospital boards of trustees, and, in connection therewith, eliminating the restriction that a board may not include more than four local residents and allowing a board to unilaterally acquire real or personal property by lease if the board has designated the public hospital as an enterprise.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Hospital Boards Of Trustees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1065 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1065 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10 Governor Signed
2019-04-01 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-26SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-25SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2019-03-11HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-08HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1065
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1065_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1065_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1065_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1065_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1065_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1065_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/62866e31bf5f673b872583b4006704c1-hb19-1065-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1065vote5ae9a3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5360d1ede373e428872583c40073713c-hb19-1065-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1065vote55bdb3

Bill Comments

feedback