CO HB1066 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning clarifying that the law enforcement and defense counsel exemption for sexual exploitation of a child crime does not change the discovery procedures for sexually exploitative material.
Title
Clarify Sexually Exploitative Material Discovery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1066 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1066 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1066 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1066 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Governor Signed | |
2018-03-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-02-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-07 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 02/08/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-06 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 02/07/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-05 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-02 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/05/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-01-30 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |